judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-510
A-510
03/07/1945
Application for Writ of Error
W. R. HUGHES
AMERICAN SURETY COMPANY OF NEW YORK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/28/1945Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
04/19/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/17/1945Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/09/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
03/07/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/28/1945Brief in Support of Petition
04/19/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/17/1945Reply to Response
03/09/1945Response to Petition
03/07/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
03/07/1945Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
American Surety Company of New YorkRespondent
W. R. HughesPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information