Case: A-511
A-511
03/07/1945
Application for Writ of Error
E. L. KELLEY, ET AL.
W. B. BARNHILL, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/23/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
04/23/1945 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
03/13/1945 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
03/07/1945 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/15/1945 | Letter Filed | | ||
05/23/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
04/23/1945 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
04/11/1945 | Bond | | ||
04/04/1945 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
03/13/1945 | Response to Petition | | ||
03/07/1945 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
03/07/1945 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
E. L. Kelley, et al. | Petitioner | |
W. B. Barnhill, et al. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information