Case Heading (S-14-0154) | |||||
Case Number: | S-14-0154 | Case Docketed On: | 06/05/2014 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Fourth Judicial District Sheridan County | Case Type: | Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief | ||
Short Title: | IRA G. TUCKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | IRA G. TUCKER, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent. |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Petitioner | Ira George Tucker | Pro Se |
Respondent | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael David L. Delicath Jenny Lynn Craig James Michael Causey |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
06/05/2014 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
06/05/2014 | Motion - In forma pauperis (not scanned, unredacted) | Motion | In forma pauperis | Final | |
06/05/2014 | Petition - Writ - review (unredacted exhibit not scanned) | Petition | Writ - review | Final | |
06/05/2014 | Motion - Stipulated Motion for Reversal of Unconstitutional Conviction and Release from Illegal Restraint | Motion | Other | Final | |
06/17/2014 | Event - Phone Call AG will not respond to Petition but may respond to Motion | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
06/20/2014 | Response/Objection - Other | Response/Objection | Other | Final | |
06/23/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Respondent's Response in Opposition to Petitioner's Stipulated Motion for Reversal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/24/2014 | Order - Petition for review - deny and Stipulated Motion for Reversal of Unconstitutional Conviction and Release from Illegal Restrain also denied | Order | Petition for review - deny | Final | |
06/24/2014 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
06/27/2014 | Event - Rejected Filing, Response to Respondent, case closed, returned to sender. | Event | Rejected Filing | Final |