judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-523
A-523
03/21/1945
Application for Writ of Error
DOCK WILLEKE
M. E. BAILEY AND R. H. FENTON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/24/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/11/1945Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/28/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
03/21/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/24/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/07/1945Miscellaneous letter
04/17/1945Bond
04/11/1945Reply to Response
04/11/1945Document received (See Remarks)
04/11/1945Document received (See Remarks)
03/28/1945Response to Petition
03/21/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dock WillekePetitioner
M. E. Bailey and R. H. FentonRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information