judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-506
A-506
02/26/1945
Application for Writ of Error
WILL G. KNOX, RECIEVER OF UNITED EMPLOYERS CASUALTY COMPANY
R. F. BALL, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/28/1945Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
12/17/1945Errata FiledRespondent
12/17/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/13/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/26/1945Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
03/09/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
02/26/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/28/1945Supplemental Brief filed
12/27/1945Letter Filed
12/17/1945Errata Filed
12/17/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/13/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/26/1945Supplemental Brief filed
05/09/1945Document received (See Remarks)
05/09/1945Document received (See Remarks)
03/09/1945Response to Petition
02/26/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/26/1945Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Allen WightAmicus Curiae
Will G. Knox, Reciever of United Employers Casualty CompanyPetitioner
R. F. Ball, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information