judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

OWENS JR., JAMES F. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CM-1067
Short Caption:OWENS JR., JAMES F. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M6141-80Filed Date:09/11/1980

Opening Event Date:09/11/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/25/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/10/1982
Argued/Submitted:01/26/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
John T. Fowler YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Mary A. Mclaughlin YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901OWENS JR., JAMES F. UNITED STATES
09/11/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/25/1981FiledRecord Completed
11/10/1982FiledBriefing Completed
01/26/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/31/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition