judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PEARSON (CLEO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34662
Short Caption:PEARSON (CLEO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C104599Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/24/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 99-07493
10/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34600, 34624, 34634, 34650, 34651, 34659, 34662. 99-09666
01/24/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 01/20/00. 00-01099
01/24/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/16/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-08170
06/12/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08182
06/12/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/05/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 19, 2001. 01-08182