judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

UNITED STATES FIDELITY AND GUARANTY COMPANY, WILLIAMS-BURKE AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES FIDELITY AND GUARANTY COMPANY, ET AL. v. LARUE AND BARRON COMPANY, ET AL., HENDERSON COUNTY, ET AL.

Case: 13160
13160
08/02/1923
Application for Writ of Error
UNITED STATES FIDELITY AND GUARANTY COMPANY, WILLIAMS-BURKE AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES FIDELITY AND GUARANTY COMPANY, ET AL.
LARUE AND BARRON COMPANY, ET AL., HENDERSON COUNTY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/28/1925Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/24/1925Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/09/1925Brief on the MeritsRespondent
03/19/1925Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
08/02/1923Response to PetitionPetitioner
08/02/1923Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
08/02/1923Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/21/1925Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
12/10/1925Letter Filed
11/09/1925Document filed (see remarks)
11/09/1925Document filed (see remarks)
10/28/1925Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/24/1925Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/22/1925Letter Filed
10/14/1925Opinion issued
04/09/1925Brief on the Merits
03/20/1925Stipulation Filed (see Remarks)
03/19/1925Supplemental Brief filed
03/18/1925Letter Filed
03/10/1925Letter Filed
03/18/1924Letter Filed
10/26/1923Letter Filed
10/24/1923Document received (See Remarks)
10/24/1923Document received (See Remarks)
10/24/1923Document received (See Remarks)
08/02/1923Response to Petition
08/02/1923Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/02/1923Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/02/1923Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company, et al.Petitioner
Henderson County, et al.Respondent
Williams-Burke and CompanyPetitioner
United States Fidelity and Guaranty CompanyPetitioner
LaRue and Barron Company, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information