judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GROSS, MYRON A. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 84-CM-0934
Short Caption:GROSS, MYRON A. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M2710-84Filed Date:07/02/1984

Opening Event Date:07/02/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/12/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppellantJohn Doe N
Rufus W. Mckinney, Jr.NY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GROSS, MYRON A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1906 VACATED ARTHUR MARC LEVIN
07/02/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/12/1984FiledRecord Completed
01/03/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition