judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-494
A-494
02/21/1945
Application for Writ of Error
OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY
MRS. CHARLES M. ALLEN, CHARLES M. THRASH, COMMERCIAL STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/03/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
03/01/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
03/01/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
02/21/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/08/1945Letter Filed
03/21/1945Motion to dismiss
03/14/1945Document received (See Remarks)
03/03/1945Response to Petition
03/01/1945Response to Petition
03/01/1945Response to Petition
02/21/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/21/1945Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Charles M. ThrashRespondent
Commercial Standard Insurance CompanyRespondent
OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANYPetitioner
Mrs. Charles M. AllenRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information