judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SMITH, JAMES HENRY DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 85-CT-1062
Short Caption:SMITH, JAMES HENRY DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:T2671-85Filed Date:07/29/1985

Opening Event Date:07/29/1985Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/03/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/18/1986
Argued/Submitted:12/01/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Edward M. Kimmel YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Karen S. Dworkin YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SMITH, JAMES HENRY DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
07/29/1985FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/03/1986FiledRecord Completed
08/18/1986FiledBriefing Completed
12/01/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/02/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition