Case Information: 38723 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: REINSTATEMENT OF WINDER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | NONE | Classification: | Bar Matter - Reinstatement - Petition |
Disqualifications: | Agosti | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/05/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
11/05/2001 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. | 01-18442 | |
04/30/2002 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Agosti. (sat in district court proceedings). | ||
05/09/2002 | Order/Dispositional Bar | Filed Bar Discipline Order. We conclude that clear and convincing evidence supports the panel's findings, and that its recommendation should be approved. "Danny Winder is hereby reinstated to the practice of law, subject to the conditions set forth above." fn4[The Honorable Deborah Agosti, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC. | 02-08152 | |
06/04/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 02-08272 | |
06/04/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/04/2002 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to Amend Order of Reinstatement. | 02-09749 | |
06/05/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Return Letter. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 and 2 this day. | 02-08272 | |
06/17/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Letter: Entered Receipt for Documents. Received by State Bar on June 10, 2002. | 02-08272 | |
07/30/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Stipulation Approved. Order Approving Stipulation and Amending Order of Reinstatement. On May 9, 2002, this court entered an order reinstating Danny Winder to the practice of law, subject to a one-year probationary period with several conditions. On June 4, 2002, Winder and the state bar filed a stipulation to amend the order of reinstatement to correct a misstatement. The May 9 order states, "Pursuant to a conditional guilty plea agreement, Winder was suspended indefinitely in 1990 following his conviction of drug-related offenses and his misappropriation of a client's settlement check." Winder's convictions occurred after the 1990 suspension, which was based solely on the misappropriated settlement check. Winder and the state bar have stipulated to amend this sentence in the order to state, "Pursuant to a conditional guilty plea agreement, Winder was suspended indefinitely in 1990 following his misappropriation of a client's settlement check." We conclude that the amendment is appropriate, and approve the stipulation. The order of reinstatement shall be amended as set forth above. Fn1[The Honorable Deborah Agosti, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC | 02-13091 |