judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-520
A-520
03/17/1945
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF SAN ANGELO
BOEHMES BAKERY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/01/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/23/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
03/17/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/03/1945Additional Copies received
11/01/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/11/1945Document received (See Remarks)
03/23/1945Response to Petition
03/17/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/17/1945Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Boehmes Bakery, et al.Respondent
CITY OF SAN ANGELOPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information