judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS (CECIL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34663
Short Caption:WILLIAMS (CECIL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35268
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C75655Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/28/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 99-07495
09/22/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The district court shall have 30 days to (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. If the court enters a written judgment the clerk shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment. 99-09018
01/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. Certified copy of the judgment or order due: 30 days from the date of this order. 00-01413
03/16/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Judgment filed in district court on 2/16/00. 00-04197
03/23/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-04681
04/28/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 4. 00-06987
04/28/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-09968
07/11/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-11895
07/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/23/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 11, 2000. 00-11895