Case Heading (S-14-0160) | |||||
Case Number: | S-14-0160 | Case Docketed On: | 06/16/2014 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Ninth Judicial District Teton County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20) | ||
Short Title: | SHANNAN KRIETEMEIER WRIGHT v. SHAWN BRICE WRIGHT | ||||
Full Title: | SHANNAN KRIETEMEIER WRIGHT, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. SHAWN BRICE WRIGHT, Appellee (Defendant). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Shannan Krietemeier Wright | Kenneth S. Cohen |
Appellee | Shawn Brice Wright | Elizabeth Greenwood Inga L. Parsons |
Other Particpants | ||
Guardian ad litem | Anne B. Ashley |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Child Custody/Visitation, Child Support, Contracts |
Opinion Number: | 2015 WY 37 |
Citation: | 344 P.3d 267 (Wyo. 2015) |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
06/16/2014 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
06/16/2014 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
06/16/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received (no appendix attached to our copy of NOA - had to request from clerk of district court) | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received | Final | |
06/16/2014 | Order - Sanction - notice of appeal | Order | Sanction - notice of appeal | Final | |
06/16/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
07/17/2014 | Fees - Sanctions received - NOA | Fees | Sanctions received - NOA | Final | |
08/04/2014 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
08/06/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief; and received copy of designation of record. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
09/18/2014 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
09/22/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Response Brief and Designation of Record on Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
10/01/2014 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
10/06/2014 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
10/07/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
10/08/2014 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
10/09/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
10/20/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
10/20/2014 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volume I - Original Papers; Volume II - Original Papers; Volume III - Original Papers; Volume IV - Original Papers; Volume V - Exhibits; Volume VI - Exhibits | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
10/20/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
03/09/2015 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part. Justice Kite writing for the court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
03/24/2015 | Petition - Rehearing | Petition | Rehearing | Final | |
03/27/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received- Appellant's Petition for Rehearing | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/07/2015 | Order - Petition for rehearing - deny | Order | Petition for rehearing - deny | Final | |
04/08/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
04/08/2015 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
04/08/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
04/08/2015 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
04/16/2015 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - record received (no date given). | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |