judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MCNEIL, JOHN C. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 84-CM-1033
Short Caption:MCNEIL, JOHN C. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M2615-84Filed Date:07/27/1984

Opening Event Date:07/27/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/06/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/06/1985
Argued/Submitted:05/14/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Dennis M. HartYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Sherri L. Berthrong YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCNEIL, JOHN C. UNITED STATES
07/27/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/06/1984FiledRecord Completed
02/06/1985FiledBriefing Completed
05/14/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/22/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition