Case Information
DV036543 | YOSHINO, NALY J. VS RADIMAK, NATHANIEL W.
Case Number
DV036543
Court
602
Judicial Officer
MCLAUGHLIN, MARCELLA O.
File Date
02/19/2013
Case Type
DV Prevention
Case Status
Dismissed
Party
Respondent
RADIMAK, NATHANIEL W.
Petitioner
YOSHINO, NALY J.
Active Attorneys
Retained
Disposition Events
10/18/2013
Judgment Type
Dismissal - Other Dismissal
Events and Hearings
-
02/19/2013 Civil Petition
-
02/19/2013 Domestic Violence
-
02/19/2013 Case Reassignment
-
02/19/2013 Court Appearance Scheduled
-
02/19/2013 Supervisory Order / OSC
-
02/19/2013 Ex Parte Application
-
02/19/2013 Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO)
-
02/19/2013 Request for Order Hearing
-
03/13/2013 Request for Order Hearing
-
03/13/2013 Court Appearance Scheduled
-
03/13/2013 Supervisory Order / OSC
-
03/13/2013 Civil Petition
-
03/13/2013 Matter Reported
-
03/13/2013 Restraining Order Granted - Petitioner
-
03/13/2013 Restraining Order After Hearing
-
03/13/2013 Restraining Order After Hearing Accepted
-
03/13/2013 Domestic Violence
-
10/17/2013 Ex Parte Hearing
-
10/18/2013 Court Appearance Scheduled
-
10/18/2013 Supervisory Order / OSC
-
10/18/2013 Dismissal
-
10/18/2013 Ex Parte Application
-
10/18/2013 Order
-
10/18/2013 Court Folder Sent To
-
03/12/2016 Notice of Case Reassignment
-
01/12/2019 Notice of Case Reassignment