judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JONES, EVELYN UNITED STATES

Case Information: 84-CM-0916
Short Caption:JONES, EVELYN UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Sexual Solicitation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M4804-84Filed Date:06/29/1984

Opening Event Date:06/29/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/20/1985Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/01/1985
Argued/Submitted:01/15/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Jack Koppelman YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Thomas J. Motley YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JONES, EVELYN UNITED STATES
06/29/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/20/1985FiledRecord Completed
10/01/1985FiledBriefing Completed
01/15/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/16/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition