Case Heading (S-16-0126) | |||||
Case Number: | S-16-0126 | Case Docketed On: | 05/06/2016 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Fourth Judicial District Sheridan County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20) | ||
Short Title: | RENEE MICHELLE TRACY, n/k/a RENEE MICHELLE BUCHLI v. SHANE ELWOOD TRACY | ||||
Full Title: | RENEE MICHELLE TRACY, n/k/a RENEE MICHELLE BUCHLI Appellant (Petitioner), v. SHANE ELWOOD TRACY, Appellee (Respondent). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Renee Michelle Buchli | Stacy Michelle Kirven |
Appellee | Shane Elwood Tracy | Brendon E. Kerns |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Child Custody/Visitation, Civil Procedure, Constitutional Law |
Opinion Number: | 2017 WY 17 |
Citation: | 388 P.3d 1257 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
05/06/2016 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
05/06/2016 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
05/06/2016 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
05/06/2016 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
06/23/2016 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
06/27/2016 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received Designation of Record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/27/2016 | Notice-Incoming - Appellant's Designation of record (Amended) | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
08/05/2016 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
08/08/2016 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief; and received proposed order. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
08/08/2016 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
08/22/2016 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
08/23/2016 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received Designation of Record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
08/24/2016 | Notice-Incoming - Appellee's Designation of record | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
08/29/2016 | Notice-Internal - Brief Only Docket Recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
09/09/2016 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
09/09/2016 | Motion - Oral argument - reassignment from expedited docket | Motion | Oral argument - reassignment from brief only docket | Final | |
09/12/2016 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
09/12/2016 | Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant; and Appellant's Motion for Oral Argument | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
09/13/2016 | Order - Assigning to brief only docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
09/19/2016 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
09/19/2016 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I - Original Papers; Volume II - Transcripts; Volume III - Exhibits | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
09/19/2016 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
09/27/2016 | Order - Denying Motion for Oral Argument | Order | Deny | Final | |
02/22/2017 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Davis writing for the court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
03/10/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
03/10/2017 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
03/10/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
03/10/2017 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
03/15/2017 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/13/2017 | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |