Case Heading (S-07-0025) | |||||
Case Number: | S-07-0025 | Case Docketed On: | 02/01/2007 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Fourth Judicial District Sheridan County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - City, County, State and Local Powers (Title 16) | ||
Short Title: | CHRISTOPHER C. COOK v. MIKE CARD, THE CITY OF SHERIDAN CHIEF OF POLICE | ||||
Full Title: | IN THE MATTER OF THE DISCIPLINE OF DETECTIVE CHRISTOPHER C. COOK Case No. 2005-04: CHRISTOPHER C. COOK, Appellant (Petitioner), v. MIKE CARD, THE CITY OF SHERIDAN CHIEF OF POLICE, Appellee (Respondent). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Christopher C. Cook | H.W. Rasmussen Newton Scott Ludwig |
Appellee | Mike Card | Clint Andrew Langer |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Administrative Law and Procedure, Other |
Opinion Number: | 2007 WY 178 |
Citation: | 170 P.3d 122 (Wyo. 2007) |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
02/01/2007 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
02/01/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
02/01/2007 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
02/01/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
03/16/2007 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
04/30/2007 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
05/03/2007 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
05/14/2007 | Brief - Appellant reply; received copy of designation of record with improper caption | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
05/15/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
05/16/2007 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
05/21/2007 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts (three separate files) | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
05/21/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Record filed | Notice-Outgoing | Record filed | Final | |
11/06/2007 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Kite writing for the court. Chief Justice Voigt files a dissenting opinion in which Justice Golden joins. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
11/26/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
11/26/2007 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
11/26/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
11/26/2007 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
11/29/2007 | Service - Certified mail signature return card | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |