judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HOWELL, MARQUIS UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CM-0963
Short Caption:HOWELL, MARQUIS UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M3743-80Filed Date:08/18/1980

Opening Event Date:08/18/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/18/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/10/1981
Argued/Submitted:05/07/1981
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HOWELL, MARQUIS UNITED STATES
08/18/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/18/1980FiledRecord Completed
03/10/1981FiledBriefing Completed
05/07/1981FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/26/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition