judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00144-CR
02-89-00144-CR
06/01/1989
All Misdemeanors
Denman, David Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/03/1991Mandate Issued
12/03/1991Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/03/1991Opinion issuedDismissed
10/24/1991Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/15/1991Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/15/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/19/1991Motion for Extension for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/17/1991Motion for Extension for Rehearing Filed
05/31/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/18/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/18/1990No Description Available.
05/02/1990Response Filed
04/17/1990Motion Filed
04/11/1990Submitted
04/11/1990Submission
04/05/1990Order Entered
12/27/1989Case ready to be set
12/27/1989Brief Filed
11/28/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/27/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/01/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/01/1989Submission
11/01/1989Brief Filed
10/30/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/18/1989Order EnteredAbated
10/18/1989Order EnteredAbated
09/27/1989Letter
07/25/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/24/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
06/23/1989Exhibits Filed
06/23/1989No Description Available.
06/07/1989No Description Available.
06/01/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/01/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/03/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Denman, David WayneCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
Honorable Virgil Vahlenkamp
96908-A
Jail 365 days, Fine $800