judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00120-CV
02-89-00120-CV
05/30/1989
Mandamus
Hudson, Michael
Densmore, Glen, Magistrate, JP No. 1, Parker County
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/03/1999Case Destroyed Per Tex. Gov't Code sect. 51.204(d)
07/06/1989Case stored
06/15/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
06/15/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/14/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
05/31/1989Submission
05/31/1989Petition for Original Proceeding
05/31/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/30/1989Motion to File
05/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/06/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable Virgil Vahlenkamp
6249