Case: 08-89-00189-CR
08-89-00189-CR
05/31/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Lara, Fernando
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/23/1990 | Shuck purged | | |
02/23/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/23/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/20/1989 | Judgment Issued | Dismissed | |
12/20/1989 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/20/1989 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
12/20/1989 | Judgment Issued | Dismissed | |
12/20/1989 | Submission | | |
12/20/1989 | Submitted | | |
12/01/1989 | Submission | | |
11/07/1989 | Brief Filed | | |
11/07/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/07/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/18/1989 | Brief Filed | | |
10/18/1989 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/02/1989 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
09/27/1989 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/15/1989 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
09/13/1989 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/01/1989 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
08/16/1989 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/02/1989 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
07/03/1989 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
07/03/1989 | Transcript Filed | | |
06/27/1989 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |
05/31/1989 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
05/31/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/23/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Steve W. Simmons |
Unknown | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Luis E. Islas |
Trial Court Information
327th District Court
El Paso
54002
25 yrs. TDC