Case: 01-89-00517-CV
01-89-00517-CV
05/30/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Blue Moon, Ltd.
Donald R. Bering
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/22/1991 | Mandate issued | | |
03/21/1991 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |
02/20/1991 | Writ disposed | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
01/03/1991 | Case file received by higher Court or agency. | | |
12/19/1990 | Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency | | |
12/14/1990 | Writ filed | | |
11/15/1990 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
09/27/1990 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
09/06/1990 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/06/1990 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/25/1990 | Response filed to a motion or to a Court order | | |
04/18/1990 | Supplemental brief filed | | |
03/27/1990 | Submitted | | |
03/27/1990 | Submission | | |
03/27/1990 | Submitted | | |
01/26/1990 | Submission | | |
12/19/1989 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
12/19/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/19/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/07/1989 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
11/16/1989 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
11/03/1989 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
11/03/1989 | Response filed to a motion or to a Court order | | |
11/02/1989 | Motion to dismiss appeal disposed | Grant motion | |
10/26/1989 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
10/26/1989 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
10/18/1989 | Motion to dismiss appeal | | |
10/13/1989 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
10/12/1989 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
09/28/1989 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
09/28/1989 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
09/13/1989 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
08/14/1989 | Statement of facts filed | | |
06/20/1989 | Filing fee paid | | |
06/15/1989 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
06/09/1989 | Filing fee paid | | |
06/06/1989 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
06/02/1989 | Filing fee paid | | |
05/30/1989 | Transcript filed | | |
05/30/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
05/03/1989 | Appeal bond filed | | |
03/08/1989 | Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21) | | |
02/06/1989 | Date judgment signed by trial judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/22/1991 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Appellant | Robert L. Collins |
State | Appellee | Hon. Anthony B. Schram |
State | Appellant | Daniel Kistler |
State | Appellee | Ronald G. Wiesenthal |
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
82-27607A