judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00519-CV
01-89-00519-CV
05/31/1989
Original proceeding for writ of habeas corpus (Gov't 22.221(d))
Shields, Charolyn Ruth Ex Parte
Yes
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/14/1989Date final opinion release for publication
10/30/1989Date final opinion release for publication
10/26/1989Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
09/29/1989Motion for rehearing filed
09/14/1989Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
09/14/1989Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
06/27/1989Submitted
06/27/1989Submission
06/27/1989Submitted
06/13/1989Brief filed
05/31/1989Motion for leave to fileGrant motion
05/31/1989Motion for leave to file
05/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/10/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateRespondentShawn Casey
StateRelator
StateRelatorSharon L. Michaels
Trial Court Information