judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00225-CV
13-89-00225-CV
05/31/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Bixenstine, Shirley Marie, Ind. and as Independent Executrix, et a l.
Palacios, Fred
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/2018Case stored
05/14/1991Cite for opinions
04/15/1991Mandate Issued
02/28/1991Motion for leave to file SOF DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Denied
02/28/1991Motion to Supplement DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/28/1991Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/02/1990Post-submission response filed
03/21/1990Submitted
03/21/1990Supplemental Citations
03/21/1990Submission
03/06/1990Submission
03/06/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
02/13/1990Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
02/13/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
01/18/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
01/10/1990Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
12/20/1989Submission
08/31/1989Motion to Supplement DisposedCarried with the case
08/31/1989Response to _____________.
08/21/1989Motion to Supplement
08/21/1989Filing Fee Paid
08/21/1989Oral argument requested
08/21/1989Brief Filed
08/21/1989Deposition Received
07/28/1989Brief Filed
07/28/1989Case ready to be set
07/28/1989Oral argument requested
07/07/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/07/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/30/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/30/1989Sworn Statement filed
06/29/1989Motion for leave to file SOF DISPOSEDCarried with the case
06/22/1989Green card in
06/22/1989Supplemental transcript filed
06/20/1989Green card in
06/19/1989Motion for leave to file Statement of Facts
06/19/1989Filing Fee Paid
06/16/1989Supplemental transcript recieved
06/16/198910 day letter sent
06/15/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
06/15/1989Statement of Facts Received
06/09/1989Information requested by the court
06/09/1989Letter sent
06/09/1989Filing Fee Paid
06/08/1989Green card in
06/08/1989Notice was filed
06/02/198910 day letter sent
06/02/1989Due date for record to be filed
05/31/1989Transcript Filed
05/31/1989Transcript Received
05/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/15/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
206th District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Joe B. Evins
C-1708-85-D