judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-89-00190-CV
07-89-00190-CV
05/31/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Dawkins, Thomas E.
Sunwest Bank of Albuquerque, N.A., et al;
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/02/1990Mandate Issued
11/07/1989Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/27/1989Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/20/1989Motion for leave to file (miscellaneous)DENIED
10/19/1989Response to any order, inquiry or motion
10/19/1989Motion for leave to file (miscellaneous)
10/13/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/25/1989Submitted
07/25/1989Submission
07/10/1989Submission
06/22/1989Case ready to be set
06/22/1989Brief Filed
06/14/1989Brief Filed
05/31/1989Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed
05/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/02/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
237th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable John R. McFall
89-525205