Case: 06-89-00033-CR
06-89-00033-CR
05/31/1989
Other Drug Possession
Robertson, Franklin
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/22/1990 | Mandate issued | | |
05/08/1990 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/24/1990 | Submitted | | |
04/24/1990 | Submission | | |
03/30/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
01/16/1990 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/08/1990 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
01/03/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
10/31/1989 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/25/1989 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
08/22/1989 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/14/1989 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
06/27/1989 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/20/1989 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
06/05/1989 | Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim) | | |
05/31/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
05/26/1989 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
05/22/1989 | Holding for Record | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/22/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
71st District Court
Harrison
Honorable Bonnie Leggat
CR-88-0257
5 years TDC