Case: PD-0787-89
PD-0787-89
05/31/1989
PDR Case Type
WALLACE, MICHAEL LYNN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/06/1989 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
09/20/1989 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
06/30/1989 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
05/31/1989 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/16/1989 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Wallace, Michael Lynn | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Charles R. Dendy |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Clyde Herrington |
Court of Appeals Information:
09-88-00266-CR
Aff 4-26-89
9th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
217th District Court
Angelina
Honorable DAVID V. WILSON
13,743