Case Information: 83-CF-1235 | |||
Short Caption: | STUTSON, MOROCCO G. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F2842-82 | Filed Date: | 09/30/1983 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/30/1983 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 08/29/1984 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 02/14/1985 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 05/16/1985 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | STUTSON, MOROCCO G. AKA ALBERT J. STUTSON UNITED STATES | |||
09/30/1983 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
08/29/1984 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
02/14/1985 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
05/16/1985 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
05/29/1985 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |