judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00531-CV
01-89-00531-CV
06/01/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
John P. Gannon, et al
John H. Baker, III
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/08/1993Mandate issued - criminal or civil
03/08/1993Mandate issued - criminal or civil
03/04/1993Order enteredGrant motion
02/04/1993Motion for leave to file
01/04/1993Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/18/1992Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
11/11/1992Writ disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
07/21/1992Case file received by higher Court or agency.
07/17/1992Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
06/29/1992Writ filed
05/28/1992Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
05/15/1992Motion for rehearing filed
04/30/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/30/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/30/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/07/1992Motion for leave to fileGrant motion
04/03/1992Depositons filed
03/11/1992Submitted
03/11/1992Submission
03/11/1992Submitted
02/26/1992Submission
02/12/1992Submitted
01/07/1992Submission
12/04/1991Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
12/04/1991Case reinstated
12/04/1991Case ready to be set
12/04/1991Case remanded from higher court
11/06/1991Higher court decisionReversed & Remanded to Ct. App
11/06/1991Writ disposedGrant motion
06/11/1991Case file received by higher Court or agency.
05/14/1991Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
05/14/1991Writ filed
05/06/1991Writ filed
04/22/1991Date final opinion release for publication
04/04/1991Extension of time to file mtn. for rehearing disp.Grant motion
04/04/1991Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
04/04/1991Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
04/04/1991Motion for rehearing filed
03/26/1991Extension of time to file motion for rehearing
03/22/1991Motion for rehearing filed
03/07/1991Opinion issuedReversed in part and in part affirmed
03/07/1991Opinion issuedReversed in part and in part affirmed
03/07/1991Opinion issuedReversed in part and in part affirmed
10/18/1989Submitted
10/18/1989Submission
10/18/1989Submitted
10/13/1989Supplemental brief filed
09/21/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
09/21/1989Case ready to be set
09/21/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/21/1989Case ready to be set
09/12/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
09/06/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/05/1989Submission
08/17/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/27/1989Motion strans disposedGrant motion
07/27/1989Supplemental transcript filed
07/14/1989Supplemental transcript filed
07/13/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
07/13/1989Motion for leave to file strans
07/13/1989Motion strans disposedGrant motion
07/13/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
06/30/1989Motion for leave to file strans
06/27/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/14/1989Filing fee paid
06/08/1989Depositons filed
06/01/1989Transcript filed
06/01/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/08/1989Appeal bond filed
04/06/1989Date judgment signed by trial judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/04/1993Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantGregory N. Jones
StateAppellantJohn Roberson
StateAppelleeLee A. Hunnell
StateAppelleeW. Wendell Hall
StateAppelleeRonald J. Palmer
StateAppelleeThomas R. McDade
Trial Court Information
189th District Court
Harris
83-17002