judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00488-CV
14-89-00488-CV
06/01/1989
Tax
Alief Independent School District
Dresser Industries, Inc., Et Al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/15/1989Case stored
08/11/1989Mandate Issued
08/11/1989Mandate Issued
07/07/1989No motion for rehearing FILED
06/22/1989Motion to withdraw appeal DISPOSED - ANT,APEGRANTED
06/22/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
06/22/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
06/21/1989Submitted
06/21/1989Submission
06/21/1989Submitted
06/07/1989Motion to withdraw appeal FILED
06/01/1989Transcript FILED
06/01/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/14/1989Motion for new trial FILED
02/14/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeHon. Randell Livingston, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. Dexter D. Joyner
Trial Court Information
190th District Court
Harris
84-16410