judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00229-CR
13-89-00229-CR
06/01/1989
Unknown Criminal Case Type.
Shirley, Bolton Cade
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/12/1990Mandate Issued
10/08/1990Record returned to Court.
09/12/1990Higher Court DecisionRefused
06/14/1990Court of Crim. Appeals Number
06/13/1990Petition for Discretionary Review sent to S.Ct.
05/29/1990Petition for Review
05/15/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
04/26/1990Motion for leave to file Supp. Trans. DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
04/26/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/13/1990Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
01/11/1990Submitted
01/11/1990Submission
01/10/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
12/20/1989Submission
09/14/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
08/31/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Denied
08/31/1989Motion for leave to file Supp. Trans. DISPOSEDCarried with the case
08/23/1989Brief Filed
08/09/1989Brief Filed
08/09/1989Case ready to be set
08/08/1989Additional Copies of Misc. Motion
08/04/1989Miscellaneous Motion
07/28/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/27/1989Brief Does not Comply
07/24/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
07/18/1989Additional copies of Motion for Leave
07/14/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
07/14/1989Motion for leave to file supplemental transcript
07/10/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/10/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
07/05/1989Supplemental transcript filed
07/05/1989Supplemental transcript recieved
06/22/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/22/1989Order Entered
06/16/1989Due date for record to be filed
06/08/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/08/1989Transcript Filed
06/08/1989Exhibits Filed
06/01/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/31/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/12/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable Whayland W Kilgore