judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00528-CV
01-89-00528-CV
05/31/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Universal Underwriters Insurance Company
Pierce, Kenneth R.
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/05/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/13/1991Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
05/08/1991Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
04/03/1991Writ disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
12/21/1990Case file received by higher Court or agency.
12/19/1990Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
12/12/1990Writ filed
11/08/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
09/28/1990Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
09/19/1990Date final opinion release for publication
09/18/1990Motion for rehearing filed
08/31/1990Motion for rehearing disposedGrant motion
08/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/31/1990Motion for rehearing granted
04/13/1990Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
04/05/1990Motion for rehearing filed
03/22/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/22/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/05/1989Submitted
12/05/1989Submission
12/05/1989Submitted
10/27/1989Submission
08/14/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
08/14/1989Case ready to be set
08/14/1989Case ready to be set
08/10/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/09/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/27/1989Motion strans disposedGrant motion
07/27/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/27/1989Supplemental transcript filed
07/18/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
07/11/1989Motion for leave to file strans
06/29/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
06/29/1989Statement of facts filed
06/16/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
05/31/1989Transcript filed
05/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/05/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/05/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantCharles J. Meyers
StateAppelleeGeorge Chandler
Trial Court Information
258th District Court
Trinity
Honorable JOE N. DEAN
14,645-A