Case: 04-89-00262-CR
04-89-00262-CR
05/31/1989
Assault or Attempted Murder
Gonzalez, Candelario
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/23/1993 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
03/08/1993 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
11/28/1989 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
11/21/1989 | Mandate received by the trial court | | |
11/17/1989 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/17/1989 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/22/1989 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/22/1989 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/21/1989 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
08/16/1989 | Postcard Notice No Statement Of Facts Filed | | |
07/19/1989 | No Description Available. | Abeyance | |
07/14/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
06/16/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
06/14/1989 | Mot. EOT to file NOA Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/13/1989 | Mot. EOT to file NOA Filed | | |
05/31/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
05/30/1989 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
03/10/1989 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
02/16/1989 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/17/1989 | Case Stored | Case stored |
11/17/2014 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
63rd Judicial District Court
Val Verde
Honorable George Thurmond
6100
3 years TDC