judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WISE, BERNARD L. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 83-CF-1174
Short Caption:WISE, BERNARD L. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1168-83Filed Date:09/14/1983

Opening Event Date:09/14/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/15/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/19/1984
Argued/Submitted:11/20/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppellantJohn Doe N
Stephen G. Milliken NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Elizabeth TrosmanYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WISE, BERNARD L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1906 VACATED ELIZABETH BRANDA VACATED GILMARTINE
09/14/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/15/1984FiledRecord Completed
07/19/1984FiledBriefing Completed
11/20/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/13/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition