judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00653-CR
05-89-00653-CR
06/01/1989
Other Felony
Merrifield, Jerry Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/10/2020Order enteredDestroy
06/13/1990Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
06/13/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/13/1990Order EnteredAbated
06/13/1990Order EnteredAbated
06/12/1990Motion for Dismissal Filed
06/06/1990Submitted
06/06/1990Submission
06/06/1990Submission
06/06/1990Submitted
04/11/1990MattConv
01/30/1990Case ready to be set
01/30/1990Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/30/1990Motion to Reconsider DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/30/1990Case ready to be set
01/05/1990Letter Filed
12/21/1989Brief Filed
12/13/1989Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/28/1989Brief Filed
11/28/1989Motion to Supplement Record
11/27/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/26/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/23/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/22/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/21/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/22/1989Statement of Facts Filed
06/07/1989Transcript Filed
06/01/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/18/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
04/24/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/10/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
86th Judicial District Court
Kaufman
Honorable Glen Monroe Ashworth
15,635
15 yrs, $50,000 Fine+Costs