Case Heading (S-15-0274) | |||||
Case Number: | S-15-0274 | Case Docketed On: | 12/04/2015 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Sixth Judicial District Crook County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Highways (Title 24) | ||
Short Title: | RAY P. EDSALL, Trustee of the RAY P. EDSALL REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, Dated October 28, 2011 v. JOY BELL MOORE and TIFFANY LA TOYA MOORE | ||||
Full Title: | RAY P. EDSALL, Trustee of the RAY P. EDSALL REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, Dated October 28, 2011, Appellant (Defendant), v. JOY BELL MOORE and TIFFANY LA TOYA MOORE, Appellees (Plaintiffs). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Ray P. Edsall | Harriet M. Hageman Korry Dawn Lewis |
Appellee | Joy Bell Moore | Matthew Ryan Sorenson Madison Megan Mankin |
Appellee | Tiffany La Toya Moore | Matthew Ryan Sorenson Madison Megan Mankin |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Attorney Fees, Roads |
Opinion Number: | 2016 WY 71 |
Citation: | 375 P.3d 799 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
12/04/2015 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
12/04/2015 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
12/04/2015 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
12/04/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
12/04/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - E-filing requirement and service of orders to Korry Dawn Lewis | Notice-Outgoing | E-filing requirement | Final | |
01/21/2016 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
01/22/2016 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Opening Brief; and received Appellant's Designation of Record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/03/2016 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
03/07/2016 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/11/2016 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
03/21/2016 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received by Madison M. Brown obo appellee | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
03/21/2016 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
03/22/2016 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
03/22/2016 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply Brief; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/22/2016 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Korry D. Lewis obo Appellant | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
03/24/2016 | Notice-Incoming - from District Court Clerk that no designation of record was filed by appellee. Called clerk and left message to send portions designated by appellant as appellee is no longer required to file a designation. | Notice-Incoming | No designation of record | Final | |
03/30/2016 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
03/30/2016 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
03/30/2016 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
04/19/2016 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Burke, Justices Hill, Davis, Fox and Kautz (Korry D. Lewis obo Appellant; Madison M. Brown obo Appellees) and taken under advisement | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
07/15/2016 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing. Chief Justice Burke writing for the court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
08/02/2016 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
08/02/2016 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
08/02/2016 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
08/02/2016 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
08/08/2016 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/4/2016. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |