judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ERIC L. DEMILLARD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-14-0032)
Case Number:S-14-0032Case Docketed On:02/04/2014
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Wyoming Rules of Criminal Procedure
Short Title:ERIC L. DEMILLARD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ERIC L. DEMILLARD, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEric Levanter DeMillard Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPeter K. Michael
David L. Delicath
Jenny Lynn Craig
Jennifer Eve Zissou

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Probation, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2014 WY 105
Citation:332 P.3d 534

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/04/2014Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/04/2014Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/04/2014Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/05/2014Event - Phone Call - Requested copy of order granting permission to proceed in forma pauperisEventPhone CallFinal
02/26/2014Correspondence - Incoming, nine envelopes with various documents.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
03/05/2014Correspondence - IncomingCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
03/10/2014Brief - Appellant (and copy of Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed in the District Court)BriefAppellantFinal
04/21/2014Motion - Other - Motion for a Paoli Remand Pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc.MotionOtherFinal
04/21/2014Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/22/2014Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/25/2014Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/30/2014Motion - Immediate Discharge, pleading purports to be four pages--half piece of paper with writing on both sides apparently pages 3 & 4. Called Attorney General to advise of filingMotionOtherFinal
05/01/2014Event - Phone Call from Jennifer Z. advising that AG's office will not respond to the discharge motion. Also, per Jenny C., AG's office will not respond to Paoli remand motion.EventPhone CallFinal
05/06/2014Order - Denying Appellant's Motion for Remand and Order Denying Petition for Immediate DischargeOrderDenyFinal
05/12/2014Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/12/2014Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/16/2014Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, fourteen volumes (Volumes I-VIII and XII-XIV, pleadings; Volume IX, miscellaneous papers; Volume X, confidential file; Volume XI, transcripts)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/16/2014Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/05/2014Notice-Incoming - Request to Withdraw Plea (not scanned, contains unredacted material)Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/05/2014Notice-Incoming - Request for order directing copies be made and withdrawal of pleasNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/05/2014Event - Phone Call to AG regarding the requests to withdraw guilty pleasEventPhone CallFinal
06/10/2014Event - Phone Call - AG will not respondEventPhone CallFinal
06/24/2014Order - Denying Appellant's MotionsOrderDenyFinal
08/19/2014Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Fox writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/04/2014Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/04/2014Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/04/2014Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/04/2014Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/08/2014Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/5/2014.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal