Case: 14-89-00487-CR
14-89-00487-CR
06/01/1989
Other Felony
Gant, Roger aka Gants, Roger
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/27/1990 | Case stored | | |
03/20/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/20/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/05/1990 | No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |
02/16/1990 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
02/01/1990 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
02/01/1990 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
01/17/1990 | Submitted | | |
01/17/1990 | Submission | | |
01/17/1990 | Submitted | | |
12/19/1989 | Submission | | |
10/19/1989 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/19/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/19/1989 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
10/19/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/12/1989 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/06/1989 | Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | | |
09/07/1989 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
09/07/1989 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
08/31/1989 | Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | | |
08/31/1989 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/22/1989 | No description available. | | |
07/21/1989 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
07/20/1989 | Transcript FILED | | |
06/01/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
05/26/1989 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |
05/24/1989 | Date of Sentence | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/27/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas | Richard A. Dawson |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - Appellant | Stephen A. Doggett |
Trial Court Information
268th District Court
Fort Bend
18,438-A
2 yrs TDC w/credit of 406