judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCOTT MADISON GOODWYN, Individually, and as a Limited Partner, for himself and derivatively on behalf of the WALLOP FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, a Wyoming Limited Partnership v. PAUL STEBBINS WALLOP AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF MALCOLM WALLOP, deceased; PAUL STEBBINS WALLOP AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE UNDER THE MALCOLM WALLOP REVOCABLE TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT DATED JANUARY 2, 2008; PAUL STEBBINS WALLOP, Individually; WALLOP CANYON RANCH, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company; WALLOP FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, a Wyoming Limited Partnership

Case Heading (S-15-0288)
Case Number:S-15-0288Case Docketed On:12/21/2015
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Corporations, Partnerships and Associations (Title 17)
Short Title:SCOTT MADISON GOODWYN, Individually, and as a Limited Partner, for himself and derivatively on behalf of the WALLOP FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, a Wyoming Limited Partnership v. PAUL STEBBINS WALLOP AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF MALCOLM WALLOP, deceased; PAUL STEBBINS WALLOP AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE UNDER THE MALCOLM WALLOP REVOCABLE TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT DATED JANUARY 2, 2008; PAUL STEBBINS WALLOP, Individually; WALLOP CANYON RANCH, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company; WALLOP FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, a Wyoming Limited Partnership
Full Title:SCOTT MADISON GOODWYN, Individually, and as a Limited Partner, for himself and derivatively on behalf of the WALLOP FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, a Wyoming Limited Partnership, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. PAUL STEBBINS WALLOP AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF MALCOLM WALLOP, deceased; PAUL STEBBINS WALLOP AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE UNDER THE MALCOLM WALLOP REVOCABLE TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT DATED JANUARY 2, 2008; PAUL STEBBINS WALLOP, Individually; WALLOP CANYON RANCH, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company; WALLOP FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, a Wyoming Limited Partnership, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantScott M. GoodwynStephen Joseph Darrah
Daniel Barry Frank
AppelleePaul Stebbins WallopAnthony Todd Wendtland
AppelleeWallop Canyon Ranch, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability companyAnthony Todd Wendtland
AppelleeWallop Family Limited Partnership, a Wyoming limited partnershipRex O. Arney

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/21/2015Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/21/2015Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/21/2015Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/21/2015Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/22/2015Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
12/28/2015Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Dismiss Appeal Filing and Supporting Brief; and received Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/28/2015Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Chief Justice BurkeNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
12/28/2015Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Justice HillNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
01/04/2016Order - Assignment of judge/justice - W. Thomas Sullins, District Judge, assigned to act in this matter for Chief Justice Burke who is recusedOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
01/04/2016Order - Assignment of judge/justice - Marvin L. Tyler, District Judge, assigned to act in this matter for Justice Hill who is recusedOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
01/11/2016Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
01/11/2016Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/12/2016Notice-Incoming - Errata appendix to Brief of AppellantNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
01/12/2016Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant Goodwyn's Response in Opposition to Appellees' Motion to Dismiss and Appellant's Motion to Strike; Appellant Goodwyn's Opening Brief and Response in Opposition to Appellees Motion to Dismiss; Appellant Goodwyn's Errata Notice of Filing Appendix to Opening BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/13/2016Reply to Response to Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
01/14/2016Notice-Incoming - Appellant's Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
01/19/2016Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' Reply on Motion to DismissEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/27/2016Order Granting Motion to Dismiss AppealOpinionPublished orderFinal
02/12/2016Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal