judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SNIPES, BARRY L. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 83-CF-1227
Short Caption:SNIPES, BARRY L. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5925-81Filed Date:09/20/1983

Opening Event Date:09/20/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/12/1985Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/31/1985
Argued/Submitted:12/05/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Fred Grabowsky YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SNIPES, BARRY L. UNITED STATES
09/20/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/12/1985FiledRecord Completed
07/31/1985FiledBriefing Completed
12/05/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/04/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition