judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0790-89
PD-0790-89
06/01/1989
PDR Case Type
WILLIAMS, DANNY LEE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/15/1989FINAL DISPRefused
08/30/1989PDR DISPRefused
07/06/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
06/01/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/25/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
WILLIAMS, DANNY LEEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)James M. Pape
STATE OF TEXASStateCappy Eads
Court of Appeals Information:
03-88-00139-CR
Aff 4-26-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
27th District Court
Lampasas
Honorable C. W. DUNCAN, JR.
5662