judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-89-00152-CR
10-89-00152-CR
06/06/1989
Other Drug Possession
Eugene Anderson
The State of Texas
No
14th Court of Appeals
06/06/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/13/1992Case stored
01/13/1992Mandate issued by this Court
12/27/1991Case returned from higher court
11/20/1991Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
09/04/1991Case forwarded to higher court
08/30/1991Petition for discretionary review filed
08/01/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/18/1991Submitted
04/18/1991Submission
02/22/1991Submission
12/15/1989Case ready to be set
12/15/1989No Description Available.
12/07/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/07/1989No Description Available.
11/06/1989No Description Available.
09/07/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/05/1989No Description Available.
08/14/1989No Description Available.
08/07/1989No Description Available.
06/06/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/12/1989No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/13/2092Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Anderson, EugeneAppellantHon. Roger Bridgwater
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
John B. Holmes
Trial Court Information
351st District Court
Harris
Honorable Lupe Salinas
503,539
Life