Case: C-9331
C-9331
12/05/1989
Second App Writ Error
B. RANDAL HARDWICK
AUSTIN GALLERY OF ORIENTAL RUGS INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/02/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
06/01/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
05/31/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
02/27/1990 | Amended motion for rehearing | Petitioner | FIRST AMENDED | |
02/20/1990 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | ON BEHALF OF TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF BANK COUNSEL-DAN L. NICEWANDER, 203 W. 10TH ST., AUSTIN, TX. 78701 472-8388 | |
02/20/1990 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
02/06/1990 | Reply to Amicus Curiae Brief | Respondent | RESPONSE TO AMICUS IN SUPPORT OF HARDWICK'S APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR | |
02/02/1990 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | TEXAS BANKERS ASSOC. 203 W. 10TH ST. AUSTIN, TX 78701 (512) 472-8388 | |
01/11/1990 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | TEX SAVINGS AND LOAN LEAGUE; C.C. SMALL, JR. 100 CONGRESS, SUITE #1100, AUSTIN, TX 78701 (512) 472-8355 | |
12/20/1989 | Reply to Response | Respondent | BEHALF OF AUSTIN GALLERY OF ORIENTAL RUGS, INC. | |
12/11/1989 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | 12 COPIES OF HARDWICK'S ANT BRIEF IN REPLY TO APPELLEE'S CROSS-POINTS | |
12/06/1989 | Reply to Response | Respondent | BEHALF OF B. RANDAL HARDWICK | |
12/05/1989 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | APP #2-AUSTIN GALLERY OF ORIENTAL RUGS, INC. | |
12/05/1989 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | APP #1-B. RANDAL HARDWICK | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/02/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
06/01/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
05/31/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
03/26/1990 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | REHEARING OVERRULED | | |
03/21/1990 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | AS AMENDED. | |
03/08/1990 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | RECORD REMAINS IN THE CLERK'S OFFICE | | |
02/27/1990 | Amended motion for rehearing | FIRST AMENDED | | |
02/20/1990 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | ON BEHALF OF TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF BANK COUNSEL-DAN L. NICEWANDER, 203 W. 10TH ST., AUSTIN, TX. 78701 472-8388 | | |
02/20/1990 | Motion for Rehearing | | | |
02/07/1990 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | APP.#2 - AUSTIN GALLERY | |
02/07/1990 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | APP.#1 - B. RANDAL HARDWICK | |
02/06/1990 | Reply to Amicus Curiae Brief | RESPONSE TO AMICUS IN SUPPORT OF HARDWICK'S APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR | | |
02/02/1990 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | TEXAS BANKERS ASSOC. 203 W. 10TH ST. AUSTIN, TX 78701 (512) 472-8388 | | |
01/11/1990 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | TEX SAVINGS AND LOAN LEAGUE; C.C. SMALL, JR. 100 CONGRESS, SUITE #1100, AUSTIN, TX 78701 (512) 472-8355 | | |
12/20/1989 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
12/20/1989 | No description available. | | | |
12/20/1989 | Reply to Response | BEHALF OF AUSTIN GALLERY OF ORIENTAL RUGS, INC. | | |
12/11/1989 | Brief on the Merits | 12 COPIES OF HARDWICK'S ANT BRIEF IN REPLY TO APPELLEE'S CROSS-POINTS | | |
12/06/1989 | Reply to Response | BEHALF OF B. RANDAL HARDWICK | | |
12/05/1989 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | APP #1-B. RANDAL HARDWICK | | |
12/05/1989 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | APP #2-AUSTIN GALLERY OF ORIENTAL RUGS, INC. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/26/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Court of Appeals Information:
03-88-00043-CV
Aff As Ref
779 SW2d 438, 03-15-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Honorable JOHN POWERS
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Travis
Honorable Michael J. Schless
139,814