judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0811-89
PD-0811-89
06/06/1989
PDR Case Type
WILSON, MICHAEL THOMAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/20/1990FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
06/20/1990REHEAR DISPDENIED
05/25/1990REHEAR FILED
05/09/1990PDR DISPRefused
07/10/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
06/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/22/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
WILSON, MICHAEL THOMASApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)John H. Hagler
Court of Appeals Information:
05-86-00088-CR
Aff 4-28-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
195th District Court
Dallas
Honorable R. T. Scales
F84-92805-UN