Case Heading (S-13-0221) | |||||
Parent: | S-13-0181 | Case Docketed On: | 10/22/2013 | ||
Consolidated: | S-13-0221 | ||||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Third Judicial District Lincoln County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1) | ||
Short Title: | HOLLY STROTH, PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE WRONGFUL DEATH ESTATE OF GARY CARL STROTH v. THAYNE AMBULANCE SERVICE (EMS) and TOWN OF THAYNE, WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | HOLLY STROTH, PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE WRONGFUL DEATH ESTATE OF GARY CARL STROTH, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. THAYNE AMBULANCE SERVICE (EMS) and TOWN OF THAYNE, WYOMING, Appellees (Defendants). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Holly Stroth | William R. Fix |
Appellee | The Town of Thayne | John D. Bowers Spencer L. Allred |
Appellee | Thayne Amburlance Service (EMS) | John D. Bowers Spencer L. Allred |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Governmental Claims |
Opinion Number: | 2014 WY 81 |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
10/22/2013 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
10/22/2013 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
10/22/2013 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
10/22/2013 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
11/01/2013 | Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance | Notice-Incoming | Entry of appearance | Final | |
11/08/2013 | Motion - Consolidate | Motion | Consolidate | Final | |
11/12/2013 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/12/2013 | Order - Consolidating cases | Order | Consolidating cases | Final | |
11/12/2013 | Order - Consolidating cases, nunc pro tunc correcting date of order | Order | Consolidating cases | Final | |
11/14/2013 | Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance | Notice-Incoming | Entry of appearance | Final | |
11/14/2013 | Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance - John D. Bowers obo Appellees | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/09/2013 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
12/12/2013 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Opening Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/18/2013 | Notice-Incoming - Designation of record | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
01/23/2014 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
01/24/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Thayne Ambulance Service (EMS) and Town of Thayne | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/04/2014 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
02/11/2014 | Motion - Extension of time - file response/objection (to submit reply brief) | Motion | Extension of time - file response/objection | Final | |
02/12/2014 | Order - Denying Appellant's Request for Extension to File Reply Brief | Order | Deny | Final | |
02/14/2014 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
02/18/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
02/18/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/20/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from John Bowers obo Appellees | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
02/27/2014 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
02/27/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
02/28/2014 | Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant re oral argument, will be attending | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
03/06/2014 | Event - Phone Call that Mr. Bowers will not be attending oral arguments and that Spencer L. Allred will present arguments obo Appellees | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
03/10/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Spencer L. Allred obo Appellees | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
03/13/2014 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Hill, Burke, Davis and Fox (William R. Fix on behalf of Appellant; Andrew F. Sears and Spencer L. Allred on behalf of Appellees) and taken under advisement. | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
06/23/2014 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
07/09/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
07/09/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
07/09/2014 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
07/09/2014 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
07/14/2014 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/11/014. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |