Case: 01-89-00555-CR
01-89-00555-CR
06/05/1989
Other Drug Sale
McDonald, Patricia Jean
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/27/1990 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
07/27/1990 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
06/30/1990 | No petition for review or writ of error was filed | | |
06/15/1990 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
05/31/1990 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/31/1990 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
02/06/1990 | Submitted | | |
02/06/1990 | Submission | | |
02/06/1990 | Submitted | | |
12/15/1989 | Submission | | |
10/27/1989 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
10/27/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/27/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/26/1989 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
10/12/1989 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
09/18/1989 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
08/18/1989 | Statement of facts filed | | |
06/29/1989 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
06/15/1989 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
06/12/1989 | Transcript filed | | |
06/05/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
05/17/1989 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
04/18/1989 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/27/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Criminal - State of Texas | |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | Cathy Herasimchuk |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | |
State | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Susan W. Burris |
State | Criminal - State of Texas |
Trial Court Information
268th District Court
Fort Bend
Honorable Brady G. Elliott
19,080
50 years TDC