judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0812-89
PD-0812-89
06/06/1989
PDR Case Type
MEEKS, CLARENCE EDWARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/15/1989FINAL DISPRefused
08/30/1989PDR DISPRefused
07/10/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
06/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/25/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
MEEKS, CLARENCE EDWARDApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Gary A. Udashen
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00559-CR
Aff 4-24-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
195th District Court
Dallas
Honorable JOE KENDALL
F88-79440-SN